Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
1 Doe, Doe-1, Doe-2, Doe-3, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mcbride Kevin Patrick, against Incyte Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Timothy P. Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy P. Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Doe-1, Doe-2, and Doe-3 against Incyte Corporation. The plaintiffs are field sales employees of Incyte Corporation who oppose the company's COVID vaccination mandate. They argue that the mandate violates their pr...
Complaint
Date: July 01, 2021Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Incyte Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Incyte Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Removal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 29, 2021Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Doe-2; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff); Incyte Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Incyte Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to File Overlength Brief; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Doe-3; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Doe-1; Filed by: Doe 1 (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-1 In Support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-3 In Support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-2 In Support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Doe-2 in support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Doe-1 in support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Place Documents Under Seal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 07/02/2021)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Doe-3 in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Place Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-3)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-1)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PLACE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion to Place Documents Und...))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Doe-2)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to File Overlength Brief
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to File Overlength Brief; H...))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.