Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Doe John, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Hathaway Mark M., against Billington Rachel, represented by Rose Alec Scott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryDefamation (Slander/Libel) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 28, 2021Complaint; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration of Michaela Lewis; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration of Rachel Billington; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Seal True Name of Defendant; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Declaration of Alec Rose in support of motion to strike; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration of Alec Rose; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration of Julia Ray; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration of Alec Rose; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of hearing on demurrer; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant); As to: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant); As to: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Declaration of Alec Rose in support of motion for attorney fees; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 18, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 14, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021Complaint
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 21, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 21, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: July 07, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT
Date: August 06, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEC ROSE
Date: August 24, 2021Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: August 24, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIA RAY
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHEL BILLINGTON
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAELA LEWIS
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION’S CONSENT TO CERTIFIED LAW STUDENT REPRESENTATION
Date: September 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEC ROSE
Date: September 02, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEC ROSE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 02, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT; HEARING O...)
Date: September 02, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL [AMENDED] TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)
Date: September 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEC ROSE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 28, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: March 03, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2022Judgment
Date: March 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 18, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 21, 2022Declaration (of Michaela Lewis) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on demurrer) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion (NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Julia Ray) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Complaint; Hearing o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion to strike) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Seal (True Name of Defendant) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: March 18, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: March 21, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion for attorney fees) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: March 18, 2022Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Rachel Billington) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Rachel Billington (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal (True Name of Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Julia Ray)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion (NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Michaela Lewis)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Rachel Billington)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S CONSENT TO CERTIFIED LAW STUDENT REPRESENTATION)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Complaint; Hearing o...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Seal ([Amended] True Name of Defendant; Declaration in Support thereof)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Opposition (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion to strike)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 21, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion (NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal (True Name of Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Julia Ray)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Michaela Lewis)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S CONSENT TO CERTIFIED LAW STUDENT REPRESENTATION)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Rachel Billington)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion to strike)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Complaint; Hearing o...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Seal ([Amended] True Name of Defendant; Declaration in Support thereof)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Opposition (FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION?S OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO SEAL TRUE NAME OF DEFENDANT)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/03/2022)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Alec Rose in support of motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.