Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Severino John, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Panish Esq Brian J, against Doe Defendant 1, Doe Defendant 2, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: October 21, 2022Attorney Certificate of Merit as to claims against doe defendant 2; Filed by: John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Attorney Certificate of Merit as to Claims against DOE Defendant 1; Filed by: John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Attorney Certificate of Merit as to claims against doe defendant 2 Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL OF ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL OF...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL OF ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Attorney Certificate of Merit as to Claims against DOE Defendant 1 Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Severino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review of his C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Mental Health Practitioner Certificate of Merit as to claims against doe defendant 2
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Mental Health Practitioner Certificate of merit as to claims against doe defendant 1
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Attorney Certificate of Merit as to Claims against DOE Defendant 1
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Attorney Certificate of Merit as to claims against doe defendant 2
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.