Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Somadhi Devindra, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shapero Sarah Elizabeth, against Real Time Resolutions Inc., Rra Cp Opportunity Trust 1, represented by Lucey Nathaniel R, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell L. Beckloff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: July 22, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration of Counsel; Filed by: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Devindra Somadhi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Counsel)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's ex parte Application for temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary R...))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.