Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
B. R., K. H., M. E., O. J., P. A., (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Snowball Timothy R., against Good Jeffrey In His Official Capacity As Executive Director Of United Teachers Los Angeles, Los Angeles Unified School District A Political Subdivision Of The State Of California, Myart-Cruz Cecily In Her Official Capacity As President Of United Teachers Los Angeles, United Teachers Los Angeles A Labor Organization, represented by Demain Jeffrey B, Evans Sue Ann Salmon, Yeomans Keith, Gottlieb Ira L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B316185; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage DENIED; Filed by:
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Opposition NON-PARTIES OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Filed by: A. S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast; Filed by: Media Agency: KCBS/KCAL
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Court's Order for Motion for Attorney's Fees hearing held on ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEO MANDANI IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B316185
Date: December 21, 2021Opposition (NON-PARTIES OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) Filed by A. S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS, H.K. ET AL, FOR TEMPORARY...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B316185) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Counsel) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Council) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (Shella Sadovnik) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Court's Order for Special Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint (SLAPP) hearing held . Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling) Filed by H. K. (Plaintiff); A. S. (Plaintiff); A. P. (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Court's Order for Motion for Attorney's Fees hearing held on Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Temporary Restraining Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (Shella Sadovnik)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Council)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Temporary Restraining Order))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs? Request for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (REPLY DECLARATION OF SHELLA SADOVNIK)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS, H.K. ET AL, FOR TEMPORARY...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Retraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Claims of R.B.)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (NON-PARTIES OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffery Good in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Leo Mandani in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request (for Judicial Notice in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira Gottlieb in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant UTLA In Support of Special Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Objection (UNION DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (Transcript of Exhibit E to Sadovnik Declaration)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...) of )
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO ENABLE USE OF COURT REPORTER FOR HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Court's Order for Special Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint (SLAPP) hearing held .
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Holding of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Court's Order for Motion for Attorney's Fees hearing held on
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of )
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B316185)
Date: December 21, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: October 29, 2021Declaration (Shella Sadovnik)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Council)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs? Request for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (REPLY DECLARATION OF SHELLA SADOVNIK)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Temporary Restraining Order))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS, H.K. ET AL, FOR TEMPORARY...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Temporary Retraining Order)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Claims of R.B.)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira Gottlieb in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Opposition (NON-PARTIES OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request (for Judicial Notice in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Leo Mandani in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffery Good in support of special motion to strike)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant UTLA In Support of Special Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration (Transcript of Exhibit E to Sadovnik Declaration)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Objection (UNION DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Holding of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Court's Order for Special Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint (SLAPP) hearing held 7/8/21.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO ENABLE USE OF COURT REPORTER FOR HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of 10/20/2021)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Court's Order for Motion for Attorney's Fees hearing held on 10/20/21
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B316185)
Date: December 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.