Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kontakt International Inc A Florida Corporation, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Fishelman Lauren R., against Katz Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021Complaint
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Kontakt International, Inc, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Kontakt International, Inc, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kontakt International, Inc, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Kontakt International, Inc, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 03/16/2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/16/2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.