Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capra Gabriel, Wright Kristin, Paragon Resources Incorporated, Royfield Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kawabata Blake Makoa, Rosenberger Elliot, Rosenberger Elliot Albert, against Capra Gabriel, Wright Kristin, Kantrowitz Christopher, Ledesma Julian Dba Jpl Management, Media Gobbler Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Berra Paul S., Matevosyan Arman, Thompson Elizabeth M, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The document ...
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: Julian Ledesma (Defendant); As to: Julian Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Gabriel Capra; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Preliminary Injunction Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Kristin Wright; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Elliot Rosenberger; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); As to: Julian Ledesma (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Sweatheory, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Elliot Rosenberger (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice Notice of Errata; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); As to: Sweatheory, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Paul S. Berra (Attorney)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Christopher Kantrowitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Julian Ledesma (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Media Gobbler, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B313624, NA; PER 8.140(b); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal B313624; NA;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance N.O.A. ; B313624; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: Julian Ledesma (Defendant); As to: Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued N.O.A. ; B313624; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript N.O.A. ; B313624; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELLIOT ROSENBERGER
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration of Order ...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Julian Ledesma In Support Of Opposition To Order To Show Cause Re: Injunction)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary R...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (with 21STCV03623 (D-58))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for temporary restraining ord...))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Defendants Opposition of TRO)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ELLIA THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR TRO)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Order to Show Cause re: Injunction)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kristin Wright)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff Gabriel Capra's Ex Parte Application for...))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elliot Rosenberger)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elliot Rosenberger)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Arman Matevosyan Pursuant to C.C.P. 430.41 Re: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Gabriel Capra)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff Gabriel Capra's Ex Parte Application For Order Waiving Posting of Undertaking)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Reconsiderati...))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 05/11/2021)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Waiving Posting of ...))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Recently-Filed Motion to Consolidate this Case with Two Others)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/20/2021)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 04/20/2021)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Preliminary Injunction Order) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Preliminary Injunction Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2021)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order re: Plaintiffs' Bank of America Financial Records)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Address or Other Contact Information)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/11/2021)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/19/2021)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of 06/18/2021)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.