Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Gold Lindsay, Walker Martel D., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Anthes Louis, against Avalonbay Communities Inc. A Maryland Corporation, Avalon Hollywood Gp Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Avalon Hollywood Lp. A Delaware Limited Partnership, represented by Everett Seymour, Everett Seymour Bernard Iii, Everett Seymour B. Iii, Gordon Eli A., Gordon Eli Allen, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Traber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 18, 2024Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet addendum sheets; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Confidential) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S MTCs; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Limited Scope Representation - NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION AMENDED
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 27, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 27, 2021Complaint
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 29, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM SHEETS
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...)
Date: February 01, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 11, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL) OF 08/13/2021
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 17, 2021Answer
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 13, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: October 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE /VESCO HEARING)
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE; NOVEMBER 5, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...)
Date: December 10, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: February 01, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: January 20, 2023Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION
Date: February 10, 2023Motion re: - MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER THE STATUTORY AND COMMON LAW GROUNDS
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS IN PROPRIA PERSONA (LINDSAY G...)
Date: February 27, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 30, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 17, 2023Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' UPDATE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING: VESCO HEARING:)
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: VESCO STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 28, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: August 30, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: September 08, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 18, 2022Application to be Relieved as Attorney on Completion of Limited Scope Representation
Date: October 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TOTO DEFENDANT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: November 01, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: November 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MTCS
Date: November 07, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: November 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANTS' HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: November 16, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC):)
Date: December 19, 2022Status Conference Report
Date: February 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING: MEDIATION AND MANDATORY SETTLEME...)
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Related Case ([cross-reference to case number: 21STUD03168 - filed on 11/23/21 - Dept. 97])
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ([cross-reference to case number: 21STUD03168 - filed on - Dept. 97])
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference /VESCO HEARING)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff For Temporary Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order - Confidential) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Vesco Hearing; Informal Discovery Confe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion For Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference regarding: Vesco Hearing:)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (addendum sheets) Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING: MEDIATION AND MANDATORY SETTLEME...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC):)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Vesco Hearing; Hearing on Motion to Comp...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation (amended) Filed by Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MTCs) Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff); Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC., a Maryland Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial, ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Martel D. Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lindsay Gold (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff For Temporary Re...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (addendum sheets)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order - Confidential) of )
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion For Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference /VESCO HEARING))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING: MEDIATION AND MANDATORY SETTLEME...))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Vesco Hearing; Informal Discovery Confe...))
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Status Conference Report
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE; NOVEMBER 5, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...) of )
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of )
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference regarding: Vesco Hearing:))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS' UPDATE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: VESCO STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL TO REMAIN ON CALENDAR FOR JULY 27, 2022
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Vesco Hearing; Hearing on Motion to Comp...))
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiffs Non-oppositions to Defendant Avalonbay Communities, Inc.'s Motions to Compel)
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Application to be Relieved as Attorney on Completion of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice (JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANTS' HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MTCs)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE; STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Relief From Waiver Of Discovery Objections)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motions to Compel)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (TOTO DEFENDANT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation (amended)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff For Temporary Re...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (addendum sheets)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/11/2021)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/21/2021)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order - Confidential) of 08/13/2021)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion For Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference /VESCO HEARING))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE; NOVEMBER 5, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAI...))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING: MEDIATION AND MANDATORY SETTLEME...))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.