Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cloud Mountain Inc., Cojecto, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Farivar Fahim, against Cojecto, Martinez Carlos, Martinez David, represented by Hofmann Katherine Mira, Soroy H. Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Bond; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrers of Defendants David Martinez and Carlos Martinez; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Fahim Farivar (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Reply SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CARLOS MARTINEZ; Filed by: Carlos Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DAVID MARTINEZ; Filed by: David Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Cojecto (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: David Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cojecto (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CARLOS MARTINEZ; Filed by: Carlos Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DAVID MARTINEZ; Filed by: David Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Application Application for Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Carlos Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Carlos Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Cloud Mountain Inc. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: David Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Cojecto (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer - ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Right to Attach Order and Claim of Exemption
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration for Ex Parte Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE lAP PLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Application (Application for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Bond)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff For A Temporary ...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Answer (TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Reply (SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CARLOS MARTINEZ)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DAVID MARTINEZ)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Defendant Carl...))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (and to File First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/25/2021)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMP...))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrers of Defendants David Martinez and Carlos Martinez
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike of Defendant D...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DAVID MARTINEZ)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CARLOS MARTINEZ)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.