Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tsai Tsai Lien, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Touceda Enrique Houston, against Song Richard, Procube Inc., represented by Park Calvin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (1 Day Estimate); Final Status Conference))
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Order
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (Re Defense Non-Opposition to Judgment)
Date: May 05, 2021Notice (FSC and TRIAL)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 04/30/2021)
Date: April 30, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2021)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Supplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Procube Inc.))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: April 30, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 03/18/2021)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Richard Song))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.