Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Merrick, Robert A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness List Filed | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.