Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lagomarsino, Deborah E, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for probate full/ltd authority (bond?) | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Duties and liabilities of personal representative | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.