Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Petricevich, Audrey, Silveira, David J., Sr, Silveira, Dominick, Silveira, Manuel, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21PR8357 MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS AND TO AMEND PRIVILEGE LOG; MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION I. MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS AND TO ... | |
March 10, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21PR8357 (Consolidated with 22PR8424, 22PR8425, 22PR8452) MOTION TO QUASH BUSINESS RECORD SUBPOENAS AND MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE In this consolidated probate case, the descendants ... | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 21PR8357 01/07/21 David’s petition to quiet title, partition and recover property (joined by Audrey, Manuel, and Dominick). Francille and David Jr. objected. Court appointed Andrew Smith to serve as p... | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for judicial notice | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for judicial notice | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.