Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lasell, David, Iltis, Sarah, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Modify Trust Absent objection, the matter will be approved.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition :Modify Trust Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed -Amended as to Kelly Bannon Lashley |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition, Filed Corrected Petition to Modify Trust -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition, Filed to Modify Trust -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust, Filed -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.