Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams, Kenrick D, Williams, Kendrick D, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Letters of Administration The following must be submitted: 1) Supplement to the Petition. The following allegations must be made without creating ambiguity, but wer...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
September 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Letters of Administration (UPDATED 9/3/21) No appearances required. Petition is recommended for approval.
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Letters Administration
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration, Filed of Kenrick Williams |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Petition to Admin Estate, Filed | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Letters of Administration, Filed | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.