Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Guzman Medina, Leticia, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Appoint Guardian of the Person Appearances required. The following must be submitted: 1) Proof of Timely Mailed Service. Proof of timely mailed service of the notice...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Appoint Guardian of Person
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian, Filed | |
August 04, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Appoint Temp. Guardian of Person Appearances required.
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Appoint Temporary Guardian of Person
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigator's Report, Filed | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed re: Response to Request for Interpreter |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence, Sent re Response to Request for Interpreter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.