Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wagner, Leon, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Terminated - Death of Conservatee | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court has been advised of the death of the Conservatee and has received the required Notice of the Conservatee's Death (Mandatory Judicial Council Form GC-399). The conservatorship has terminated, all Court Investigator fees previously deferred are waived, and the matter is closed. No appearance is required. |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only 6 Month Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conservatee's Death | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Conservatorship Status Report | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order Appointing and Letters |
|
June 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed 5/21/2021 the conservatorship is necessary and appropriate, and the petition is granted. The Court Investigator information sheet is due November 16, 2...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed 5/21/2021 the conservatorship is necessary and appropriate, and the petition is granted. The Court Investigator information sheet is due November 16, 2021 with a 6-month review hearing on December 28, 2022 at 10:15 a.m. Counsel to submit a form of order within 2 weeks. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.