Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Groark, Patrick, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person And Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Probate Notes: First Account and Report of Guardian The minute order filed April 25, 2023 ordered Ms. Fairbanks to submit a proposed order revoking the Guardianship of the Estate. No such order was fi...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
April 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1) First Accounting and Report 2) Review Hearing re: Letters of Guardianship in Utah Probate Notes: First Account and Report of Guardian A Notice to File Accounting was served o...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
February 07, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: First Accounting and Report Each guardianship of estate must be reviewed by the court 1 year after initiated and thereafter no less frequently than 2 years. (Prob. Code, § 2620....
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
December 13, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Fix Residence Outside the State Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis, generally five days before the hearing. If no probate notes are post...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters, Filed | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Appointing Guardian or Extending Guardianship of the Person |
|
May 25, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Appoint Guardian of the Person Appearances required. The following must be submitted: 1) Proposed Orders (Forms GC-240 & GC-224) 2) Proposed Letters (Form GC- 25...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Appoint Guardian of Person and Estate
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.