Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tabatabaei Ashkezari, Faezeh, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: March 08, 2021Petition to Administer Estate
Date: March 08, 2021Petition Hearing
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 30, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
July 19, 2022 |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
May 03, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
The First and Final Account and Report of Executor is settled and approved. The matter is set for a final discharge hearing on November 1, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the forms of order subm...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution; Continued 04/05/2022 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Settling First and Final Account and Final Distribution Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The First and Final Account and Report of Executor is settled and approved. The matter is set for a final discharge hearing on November 1, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the forms of order submitted by counsel. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.