Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oelschlager, Katie, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate-Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Death |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Administration and Letters of Administration |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate, Filed -Appointing Administrator -HRG: 4/1/21 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters, Filed of Administration |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Supervision Begins Appointment of Personal Representative | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Creditor's Claim, Filed of Kayla Oelschlager for $TBD |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Creditor's Claim, Filed of Brittany Oelschlager for $TBD |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Creditor's Claim, Filed by Courtney DeSoto for amount TBD |
|
April 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Letters of Administration
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
April 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Letters of Administration Absent objection, the Petition will be granted.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.