Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pollard, Stephen H, Pollard, Michael D, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Confirming Trust Assets -HRG: 3/18/21 |
|
March 18, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Confirm Trust Assets Absent objection, the matter will be approved.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
March 18, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Confirm Trust Assets
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Petition Confirm Trust Assets Granted |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition :Confirm Trust Assets Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG: 3/18/21 |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.