Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bowles, Steven W., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: February 03, 2021Letters Issued
Date: March 02, 2021Petition to Administer Estate
Date: February 03, 2021Petition Hearing
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: December 06, 2021Proof or Affidavit of Publication
Date: February 26, 2021Review Hearing
Date: March 01, 2022Accounting Hearing
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 02, 2021Order Appointing Administrator
Date: March 02, 2021Notice
Date: March 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 28, 2021Order
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 29, 2021Inventory and Appraisal
Date: June 17, 2021Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution
Date: December 06, 2021Order
Date: June 24, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: June 24, 2022Receipt
Date: March 08, 2022Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative
Date: February 03, 2021Waiver
Date: February 08, 2021Review Hearing
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Final Distribution by Jolene M Keehely Review Hearing Final Discharge Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 24, 2022 |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
June 24, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
March 08, 2022 |
Receipt on Final Distribution by Jolene M Keehely Receipt |
||
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action Review Hearing Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 29, 2021 | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | ||
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Accounting Hearing First and Final Report and Account of Administrator and Petition for (1) Its settlement, (2) Allowance of Statutory Compensation to Administrator and to Attorney, and (3) Final Distribution Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (1) Settling First and Final Report and Account of Administrator, (2) Allowing Statutory Compensation to Administrator and to Attorney, and (3) Authorizing Final Distribution Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.