Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, Cecilia Maria, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryLimited Conservatorship - Person |
Last RefreshedJuly 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report 1st Annual Report Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
November 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Court Investigator’s Biennial Review The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required. The next revi...
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report 6 Month Status Report Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 23, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Conservatorship Compliance Hearing No appearances required. Compliance achieved.
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Review Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conservatee's Rights, Filed | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Determination Conservatee Appropriate Level of Care, Filed | |
April 26, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Conservatorship of the Person Appearances required. The proposed conservatee is expected to attend the hearing. (Prob. Code, § 1825.)
Judge: Judge Jed Beebe |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Appoint Conservator of Person
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.