Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Galarza, Jesus Martine, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition to Administer Estate
Date: January 21, 2021Petition Hearing
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
Review Hearing Final Distribution; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 18, 2023 | Status Report | ||
July 18, 2023 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
July 18, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from Administrator Jesus Galarza regarding the status of filing the petition for final distribution. |
||
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Final Distribution; continued from 2/8/22, 8/9/22 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from Jesus Martine Galarza regarding the filing of a petition for final distribution. |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Report and Request for Continuance of Hearing Date Review Hearing Final Distribution; continued from 2/8/2022 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.