Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Turnbull, Patricia Marie, Turnbull, Richard Leonard, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2021 | Proof of Mailing of Order Denying Petition for Guardianship | ||
February 22, 2021 |
Order Denying Petition for Guardianship
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
February 18, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Guardianship Status Report | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Striking Appointment of Temporary Guardian and Letters of Temporary Guardianship
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order Striking Appointment of Temporary Guardian and Letters of Temproary Guardianship |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Guardianship Status Report | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigation Fee (PR1513.1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.