Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Klith, Karen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship Person Only |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.