Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caya, Jason Robert, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Caya, Allison Marie, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request Filed 08/19/2021 - Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Temporary Restraining Order as to the Respondent | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order - Minor Children (New File) |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.