Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams, Michele, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Salez, Bailey Paul, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request Filed 08/16/2021 - Temporary Orders Partially Granted Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Notice of Court Hearing - Temporary Orders Partially Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.