Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Walters, Cecilia Marie, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Cassibba, Rita Ann, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Order - Elder/Dependent Abuse Request filed 08/13/2021 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of EA-109, EA-100, EA-120, EA-250, EA-800 Served on Respondent | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.