Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sexton, Vanessa, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bronk, Dustin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Petitioner's Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, Reconsider Orders Made & Re-Referral to Mediation; filed 02/24/2022 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the FL-300 as to the Respondent | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170) Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, Reconsider Orders Made & Re-Referral to Mediation |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner Filed 5-21-2021 3 Year Restraining Order Granted (child is excluded) - Set from 11/17/2021 on the Petitioner's Objection to the Mediation Recommendation Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Recommendation and Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Report of Child Custody Recommending Counelor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.