Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Heise Fay, Lindy Danielle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Angel, Daryl Scott, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
June 03, 2021 |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expiration Date 05/26/2024 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request Filed 05/17/2021 - Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Personal Service of Notice of Hearing, Temporary Restraining Order & Notice of Assignment as to Respondent |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Unsuccessful Service of Temporary Restraining Order as to Respondent |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.