Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shipley, Alicia A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ferguson, Morgan A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2038 |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Dismissal Judge: Candela, Michael P |
||
November 13, 2023 |
Court Trial Regarding Remaining Issues of Child Support, Child Care & Supervised Visitation Expenses - Per Stipulation filed on 10/31/2022 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
||
November 07, 2023 |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent's Request for Order for Change in Custody, Visitation, Child Support & Temporary Orders Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
October 16, 2023 | Declaration of Katrina Kjellstrom | ||
October 11, 2023 |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service of Temporary Emergency Orders, Request for Order, and Income and Expense Declaration as to Jody M. Peterson |
||
October 03, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
October 03, 2023 |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration in Support of Request for Emergency Temporary Orders |
||
October 03, 2023 |
Ex Parte Order
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
||
October 03, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
October 03, 2023 |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Modify Custody or Visitation (FC3170) Request for Order for Change in Custody, Visitation, Child Support & Temporary Orders Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.