Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Haley, Lindsey, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Keen, Marlon, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 |
Returned Mail Notice of Returned Documents, Proof of Service by Mail |
||
April 09, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
April 09, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 3/15/21; Amended Temporary Restraining Order filed 3/17/2021 - Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 07, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Amended Temporary Restraining Order Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.