Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alexander, Rose, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Alexander, Chad, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent's Request for Order re Custody, Visitation, and Temporary Orders Denied - OST Granted Filed 8/11/2023, Continued from 09/06/2023 for Service - Continued from 10/11/2023 for Receipt of the Mediation Report Judge: Candela, Michael P |
||
October 24, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
October 24, 2023 | Mediation Agreement and Proposed Order | ||
October 11, 2023 | Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | ||
October 11, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
October 11, 2023 |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent's Request for Order re Custody, Visitation, and Temporary Orders Denied - OST Granted Filed 8/11/2023, Continued from 09/06/2023 for Service Judge: Candela, Michael P |
||
September 06, 2023 |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
||
September 06, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
September 06, 2023 |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent's Request for Order re Custody, Visitation, and Temporary Orders Denied - OST Granted Filed 8/11/2023 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
||
September 06, 2023 |
Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.