Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Malloy, Kristina N B, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Malloy, Adam J Q, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
March 29, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Chandler, Christopher R |
||
March 24, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 3-3-2021 Temporary Order Granted Judge: Chandler, Christopher R |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Notice of Court Hearing - Temporary Order Granted Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.