Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Gardner, Sarah vs Gardner, William

Case Last Refreshed: 1 day, 10 hours

Case Overview

On February 16, 2021 case was filed by Gardner, Sarah, against Gardner, William, in the jurisdiction of Butte County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

February 16, 2021

Last Refreshed

May 06, 2021

Filing Location

Butte County, CA

Category

Dissolution w/ Minor Children

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial

judge: McLean, Sandra L

Docket Event RFO/OSC Motion Hearing
Respondent's Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration filed 03/30/2021

judge: Keithley, Clare

Docket Event RFO/OSC Motion Hearing
Respondent's Filed 3/17/2021 Re: Custody, Visitation, and Temporary Orders; Continued from 3/17/2021 for receipt of Mediation Report.

judge: Keithley, Clare

Docket Event Proof of Mailing
Docket Event Findings and Order After Hearing- 04/13/2021

judge: Keithley, Clare

Docket Event Proof of Mailing
Docket Event Report of Child Custody Recommending Counselor
Docket Event Recommendation of CCRC and Proposed Order
Docket Event Substitution of Attorney
Docket Event Proof of Service
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.