Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richardson, Cody Michael, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Davis, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Custody And Support Of Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 3rd Judge: Candela, Michael P |
||
March 10, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
March 09, 2022 |
Order to Strike or Void Filing GC 68634(g)
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
||
February 16, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Family Law Status Conference (CRC 5.83) | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Hearing - Predispo Court's Motion Regarding Petitioner's Fee Waiver Request; 02/11/2021 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.