Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Seltzer, Karen, Seltzer, Robert, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Patterson, Tara, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 3rd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Request for Order to Change Visitation, Filed on 05/26/2021, Trial set on Visitation per Counsel's Request Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Visitation and Order Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.