Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chouinard, George H, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Chouinard, Paul J, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing of 2/24/2021; Expires 2/24/2024
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 02/08/2021 for DV; Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Hearing, Request for Elder Abuse and Temporary Restraining Order Served on Respondent | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence All Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.