Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Russell, Jordyn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Thomas, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing | ||
February 18, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Temporary Restraining Order - Filed 01/29/2021 - Temporary Orders Partly Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 2-17-2024
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Partly Granted Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.