Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Santana, Cynthia Lee, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Norris, Phil John, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order - Filed 01/28/2021 - Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 28, 2021 | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- No Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.