Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Marklund, Brian J, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bocast, Terra, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order, Temporary Orders Granted in Part Filed 01/22/2021 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 10, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
February 10, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order Questionable Service - Service Date is Before the Temporary Restraining Order was Granted |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Granted in Part Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.