Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Petty, Mandie Rae, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Shelton, Joshua Edward, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Candela, Michael P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCandela, Michael P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
Receipt Acknowledgment of Receipt of Transfer |
||
December 14, 2022 |
Review Hearing Petitioner's Request for Order for Change of Venue filed 09/19/2022 - Status of Transfer Yuba County Judge: Candela, Michael P |
||
December 13, 2022 | Transfer Out | ||
December 13, 2022 | Notice of Transfer | ||
November 21, 2022 | Proof of Service of the Findings & Order After Hearing as to Respondent | ||
November 08, 2022 |
Proof of Service Proof of Unsuccessful Service of Findings and Order After Hearing |
||
October 24, 2022 |
Change of Venue Granted
Judge: Chandler, Christopher R |
||
October 19, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner's Request for Order for Change of Venue filed 09/19/2022 Judge: Chandler, Christopher R |
|
October 19, 2022 | Findings and Order After Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.