Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pierce, Laura, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Pierce, Derek, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Candela, Michael P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCandela, Michael P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Order for Change in Domestic Violence Order to End Restraining Order - Filed 5/23/2022 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of FL 300 & FL 320 to Respondent | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - DV (No Fee) Request for Order for Change in Domestic Violence Order to End Restraining Order |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Restraining Order After Hearing as to the Respondent | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 2/3/2024 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-14-2021 Temporary Order Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.