Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilson, Olga, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wilson, David Troy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted | ||
August 17, 2023 | Request to Waive Court Fees | ||
December 07, 2021 | Remittitur | ||
October 13, 2021 | Order from the Third District Court of Appeal Dismissing Appeals Filed July 27, 2021. | ||
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order filed 1/13/21 - Temporary Orders Denied -All Day Set Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order filed 1/13/21 - Temporary Orders Denied - All Day Set Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Amended Minute Order |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Respondent's Request for Judicial Notice |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Hearing Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.