Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Friese, Tamara, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Creason Mullinex, Cheren, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
February 05, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-12-2021 Temporary Order Denied Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 03, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Notice of Court Hearing - Temporary Order Denied Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Temporary Restraining Order - Not Used | |
January 12, 2021 | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- No Minor Children (NF) | ||
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.