Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dingman, Patricia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Castaneda, Nicole Michele, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeithley, Clare Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
January 22, 2021 |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 1/20/2026 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
January 20, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Filed 01/04/2021 - Temps Denied Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order as to Respondent | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 04, 2021 | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- No Minor Children (NF) | ||
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Temporary Restraining Order Temps Denied - Not Used |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.