Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Silveira, David J, Sr, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Peters, Francille Elaine, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder Or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order-Elder Abuse/Dependent Adult
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary restraining order | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.