Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Erlinda Reyes, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mehrdad Bokhour, against Vitas Healthcare Corporation Of California, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 26, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 25, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 24, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 23, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 22, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
February 21, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 3 for tentative ruling. California (Class Action/PAGA) | |
January 16, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 2 for tentative California (Class Action/PAGA) ruling. | |
January 15, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 2 for tentative California (Class Action/PAGA) ruling. | |
January 14, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV383092 Reyes v. Vitas Healthcare Corporation of See Line 2 for tentative California (Class Action/PAGA) ruling. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.