Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Go, Kristeen Leigh, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: October 19, 2021Petition for Change of Name, Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Assignment (South) Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed hrg: 11/22/2021 |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name, Filed | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.